MD SB459 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified campaign finance law definitions to include campaign finance activity relating to prospective questions to be placed on the ballot; prohibiting a chief election official from certifying a petition if the petition sponsor fails to provide proof of filing a specified campaign finance report; repealing specified requirements that a statement of contributions and expenditures for a petition be filed at the time the petition is filed; etc.
Title
Campaign Finance - Ballot Issue Committees - Prospective Questions
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (91-43) (Y: 91 N: 43 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (91-43) |
2016-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Special Order until later today (President) Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {994939/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Hough) Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {994939/1 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Ballots
Campaign Financing
Committees and Commissions
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Gifts
Petitions
Reports
Signatures
Campaign Financing
Committees and Commissions
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Gifts
Petitions
Reports
Signatures