MD SB459 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Montgomery County a special Class B beer, wine and liquor (BWL) (clubhouse/lodge) license; specifying that the Board of License Commissioners may issue a Class B-BWL (clubhouse/lodge) license only to a specified person for use by a specified facility; specifying that a Class B-BWL (clubhouse/lodge) license authorizes a holder to serve specified alcoholic beverages on the licensed premises, off the licensed premises, or for tasting purposes for free or for a fee; etc.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine and Liquor (Clubhouse/Lodge) License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 504 |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {244632/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Country Clubs
Education
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Restaurants
Sports and Recreation
Substance Abuse
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Country Clubs
Education
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Restaurants
Sports and Recreation
Substance Abuse