MD SB458 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of Trustees of the Maryland Teachers and State Employees Supplemental Retirement Plans to consider using minority business enterprises for investment advisor and fund manager services; requiring the Board to use the Office of State Procurement's website and the State's electronic procurement system to provide notice to potential providers; and requiring the Board, in consultation with a certain entity, to identify entities that have been certified as minority business enterprises under certain circumstances.
Title
Maryland Teachers and State Employees Supplemental Retirement Plans - Use of Minority Business Enterprises
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 116 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 392 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (116-17) |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:40 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {773823/1 Adopted |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 9:00 a.m. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB909 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-22 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agents and Brokers
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
internet
Investments
Minorities
Notices
Procurement
Retirement
Small Business
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Transportation, Department of
Women
Agents and Brokers
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Communications
internet
Investments
Minorities
Notices
Procurement
Retirement
Small Business
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Transportation, Department of
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 35 | 302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |