MD SB453 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists to issue cease and desist orders or obtain injunctive relief for violations of specified provisions of law; authorizing an action to be maintained in the name of the State or the Board to enjoin specified unauthorized practice or conduct that is a ground for specified disciplinary action; etc.
Title
State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists - Cease and Desist Orders and Injunctive Relief
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-0) (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Attorney General
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Damages
Discipline
Evidence
Health Occupations
Hearing Aids
State's Attorneys
Audiologists and Speech Pathologists
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Damages
Discipline
Evidence
Health Occupations
Hearing Aids
State's Attorneys