MD SB452 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Delegates Moon, W. Fisher, and Bartlett
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-08 - Delegates Moon, W. Fisher, and Bartlett
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that, pending a determination by a court exercising criminal jurisdiction in a case involving a child whether to transfer its jurisdiction to the juvenile court, provisions of law relating to the confidentiality of juvenile records apply to all police records and court records concerning the child from the time of the child's arrest until a certain event occurs; establishing that, if a case is transferred to the juvenile court, certain provisions of law relating to confidentiality of juvenile records continue to apply; etc.
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults – Confidentiality of Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-7) (Y: 132 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Delegates Moon, W. Fisher, and Bartlett |
2019-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-08 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senators West, Ready, and Waldstreicher |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (132-7) |
2019-04-05 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Wilson) Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {582412/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {538174/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Criminal Law - Procedure
Expungement
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Minors
Photography
Privacy
Records
Video
Warrants
Expungement
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Minors
Photography
Privacy
Records
Video
Warrants