MD SB452 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that provisions of law relating to the regulation of other tobacco products do not apply to a seller located outside the State when selling, holding for sale, shipping, or delivering specified cigars or pipe tobacco to consumers in the State; providing that specified provisions of law regulating the sale and distribution of other tobacco products do not apply to the order, purchase, sale, or shipment of specified cigars or pipe tobacco by a licensed other tobacco products retailer or licensed tobacconist; etc.
Title
Other Tobacco Products - Restrictions on Sale, Distribution, and Shipment -
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Barry Glassman [R] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] |
Sen. E.J. Pipkin [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-03-20 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-18 | Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) 273720/1 Adopted | |
2012-03-18 | Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) 113621/1 Withdrawn | |
2012-03-17 | Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted | |
2012-03-17 | Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) 113621/1 | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments 817278/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-02-03 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | |
2012-02-03 | Re-assigned Finance & Budget and Taxation | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Budget and Taxation & Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Commerce
Fines
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Special Tax Districts
Storage
Tobacco
Transportation
Comptroller
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Electronic Commerce
Fines
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Penalties and Sentences
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Special Tax Districts
Storage
Tobacco
Transportation