MD SB452 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Anne Arundel County Board of Education to develop and approve, on or before a specified date, procedures and guidelines for the reimbursement of board member travel and other expenses; requiring the expense reimbursement policy to include specified items; requiring the county board to submit a specified report to the Anne Arundel County Delegation before a specified day; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Title
Anne Arundel County Board of Education - Members - Expense Reimbursement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2011-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |