MD SB450 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Open Meetings Law Compliance Board, in conjunction with the Office of the Attorney General, to develop, conduct educational programs and distribute educational materials on the requirements of the open meetings law to the staff and attorneys of specified entities; requiring the Board to post specified information on violators of the Act on a specified Web site; prohibiting a public body from meeting in a closed session except under specified circumstances; establishing specified reporting requirements; etc.
Title
Open Meetings Act - Annual Reporting Requirement, Web Site Postings, and Training
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 526 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {996389/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {964436/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Associations
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Job Training
Notices
Open Government
Public Employees
Public Officials
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Time
Associations
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Education, Boards of
Electronic Government
Job Training
Notices
Open Government
Public Employees
Public Officials
Reports
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Time