MD SB45 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the settlement provision required to be included in policies of health care malpractice insurance to clarify that the insurer is authorized, without restriction, to negotiate and effect a compromise of claims unless the settlement amount exceeds the limits of the insurer's liability.
Title
Health Care Provider Malpractice Insurance - Authorization to Settle - Clarification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 106 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-26 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |