MD SB45 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Criminal Justice Information System Central Repository of the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide to the Motor Vehicle Administration specified revised criminal history record information under specified circumstances; altering the application process for a criminal history records check for driving instructors; making a technical correction; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Driving Instructors - Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-14 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Criminal Background Investigations
Driver Education
Fingerprinting
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Driver Education
Fingerprinting
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration