MD SB45 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the use of a certificate of completion of a specified alcohol awareness program by specified employees or employers at more than one licensed establishment in Dorchester County.
Title
Dorchester County - Alcohol Awareness Program - Certificate of Completion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-07 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2012-03-30 | Returned Passed | |
2012-01-31 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-01-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-01-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-01-26 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-05 | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-10-11 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Dorchester County
Education
Licenses
Substance Abuse
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Dorchester County
Education
Licenses
Substance Abuse