MD SB449 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to include as part of the personal needs allowance guardianship fees for guardianship services when determining the portion of income specified recipients of Maryland Medical Assistance Program benefits are required to contribute to the cost of their care under the Program; specifying the amount of the personal needs allowance for specified guardianship fees; etc.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Guardianship Fees - Personal Needs Allowance
Sponsors
Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Brian Feldman [D] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] |
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 390 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2016-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {307273/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Courts
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Fees
Guardians
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Personal Property
Public Health
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Fees
Guardians
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Medical Assistance
Personal Property
Public Health
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation