MD SB449 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified criminal history records checks for physicians, physician assistants, respiratory care practitioners, radiation oncology/therapy, medical radiation, and nuclear medicine technologists, polysomnographic technologists, athletic trainers, perfusionists, and naturopathic practitioners; requiring, beginning October 1, 2016, specified criminal history records checks for specified annual renewal applicants and former licensees who file for reinstatement under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
State Board of Physicians - Physicians, Physician Assistants, and Allied Health Practitioners - Licensure Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34 |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-18 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {774033/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Fees
Fingerprinting
Health Occupations
Hearings
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Osteopaths
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Privacy
Radiation
Review Boards
Sports and Recreation
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Fees
Fingerprinting
Health Occupations
Hearings
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Osteopaths
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Privacy
Radiation
Review Boards
Sports and Recreation