MD SB448 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a network of oyster sanctuaries in the five tributaries identified by the Department of Natural Resources for large-scale restoration pursuant to the 2014 Chesapeake Bay Watershed Agreement; codifying the boundaries of certain oyster sanctuaries; prohibiting a person from catching oysters in or removing oysters from a certain oyster sanctuary, subject to a certain exception; requiring the Department to provide reports on certain restoration plans to certain committees of the General Assembly by certain dates; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oysters - Tributary-Scale Sanctuaries - Protection and Restoration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-13) (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {243729/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {203224/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {883322/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (14-32) (Y: 15 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {223722/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-32) (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {553820/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (14-32) (Y: 15 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {343726/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (14-33) (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {573222/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-31) (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {413529/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (16-31) (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {293626/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30) (Y: 17 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 3/12 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-31) (Y: 16 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (34-13)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12SenateFloor Amendment {573222/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-31)
2019-03-12SenateFloor Amendment {553820/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (14-32)
2019-03-12SenateFloor Amendment {413529/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (16-31)
2019-03-12SenateFloor Amendment {343726/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (14-33)
2019-03-12SenateFloor Amendment {243729/1 (Senator Bailey) Rejected (15-31)
2019-03-12SenateFloor Amendment {223722/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-32)
2019-03-12SenateFloor Amendment {203224/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (15-31)
2019-03-12SenateFloor Amendment {883322/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (14-32)
2019-03-08SenateSpecial Order until 3/12 (Senator Miller) Adopted
2019-03-08SenateFloor Amendment {293626/1 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected (16-30)
2019-03-07SenateLaid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2019-03-07SenateFloor Amendment {293626/1 (Senator Eckardt)
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2019-03-07SenateMotion Special Order until 3/12 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-31)
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments
2019-03-06SenateSpecial Order until 3/7 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {174130/1
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0448&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0448f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0448t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0448_17413001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0448_29362601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0448_20322401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0448_22372201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0448_24372901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0448_34372601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0448_41352901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0448_55382001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0448_88332201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/sb0448_57322201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/sb0448.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0448_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0392.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0427.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0467.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0468.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0469.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0470.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0471.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0472.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0473.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0474.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0529.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback