MD SB447 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a cheese and deli shop wine privilege in Frederick County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue the privilege for use by an establishment for which a Class A beer and wine license has been issued that derives at least 50% of its total average daily receipts from the sale of cheese, meats, sandwiches, and other products normally associated with delis; authorizing the holder of the privilege to sell wine by the glass for on-premises consumption under certain circumstances; specifying a privilege fee of $100; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Wine Privilege – Cheese and Deli Shops

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 276
2018-03-30SenateReturned Passed
2018-03-29HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-03-28HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-28HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-28HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-13HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-03-12SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-03-08SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments {834439/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-23SenateHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback