MD SB446 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Disabilities, in cooperation with the National Federation of the Blind, to study and make recommendations regarding accessibility concepts in computer science, information systems, and information technology programs in higher education; requiring the Department to submit a preliminary report and a final report of its findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before specified dates; etc.
Title
Department of Disabilities - Study of Accessibility Concepts in Computer Science, Information Systems, and Information Technology Programs in Higher Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 502 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {224539/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Blind Persons
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Higher Education
Information Technology, Department of
Legislation
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Disabilities
Disabilities, Department of
Higher Education
Information Technology, Department of
Legislation
Reports
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology