MD SB445 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Health Care Commission, in consultation with the Maternal and Child Health Bureau, the Vital Statistics Administration, and interested stakeholders, to conduct a study regarding the surgical birth rate in the State; requiring the Commission to examine the rate of complications, increased health care costs, and global research programs related to surgical births; requiring the Commission to report its recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before November 1, 2020; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Health Care Commission - Surgical Birth Rate - Study

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateUnfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
2019-02-15SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback