MD SB444 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Workgroup to Study the Transformation of Manufacturing in Maryland's Emerging Digital Economy; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Workgroup; requiring the Workgroup to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters relating to the State's current and future workforce and emerging digital economy; requiring the Workgroup to submit an interim report and a final report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2021, and December 1, 2022, respectively; etc.
Title
Transforming Manufacturing in a Digital Economy Workgroup (Making It in Maryland)
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 27 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Floor Amendment 293229/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - Floor Amendment 293229/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 94 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 582 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | House | House Recede |
2021-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-27) |
2021-04-08 | House | Motion Recede (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted |
2021-04-08 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Klausmeier and Hershey) |
2021-04-08 | House | Senate Requests House Recede |
2021-04-08 | House | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Feldman, Klausmeier and Hershey) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Refuses Concur House Amendments |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-38) |
2021-03-30 | House | Floor Amendment {293229/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (38-94) |
2021-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {533093/1 Adopted |
2021-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {317078/1 Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB658 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 581
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Corporations and Associations
COVID-19
Education
Electronic Communication
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Legislative Services, Department of
Minorities
pandemics
Partnerships
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Sunset
Tax Credits
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Corporations and Associations
COVID-19
Education
Electronic Communication
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Legislative Services, Department of
Minorities
pandemics
Partnerships
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Small Business
Sunset
Tax Credits
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment