MD SB444 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City; requiring, to the extent practicable, the Task Force to reflect a certain diversity; requiring the Task Force to identify and examine certain negative social factors and develop and implement solutions to improve the circumstances in which residents of Baltimore City live, work, play, and worship; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 1 of each year; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.
Title
Task Force on the Social Determinants of Health in Baltimore City
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 2/22 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 2/22 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-31) (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 708 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {156384/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-22 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/22 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-31) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {267675/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Diseases
Education
Health
Health Occupations
Housing
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Reproductive Matters
Social Services
Students
Sunset
Time
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Diseases
Education
Health
Health Occupations
Housing
Job Training
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Reproductive Matters
Social Services
Students
Sunset
Time
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment