MD SB443 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the manufacturer of a connected device to equip the device with a certain reasonable security feature; providing that a security feature for a connected device is reasonable if the connected device is equipped with a certain means for authentication; providing that a violation of the Act is an unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practice within the meaning of the Maryland Consumer Protection Act and is subject to certain enforcement and penalty provisions; etc.
Title
Consumer Protection - Security Features for Connected Devices
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB888 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Consumer Protection
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Equipment
Ethics
internet
Mobile Devices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Retail Sales
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Consumer Protection
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Equipment
Ethics
internet
Mobile Devices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Retail Sales
Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 13 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Commercial Law | 14 | 4204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |