MD SB442 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Providing, under certain circumstances, that the provisions of the Minority Business Enterprise Program apply to public-private partnerships; altering, from July 1, 2020, to July 1, 2023, the date by which certain provisions of law relating to minority business participation goals are of no effect and may not be enforced; incorporating certain findings and evidence associated with the Program; requiring certain applicants for certain wind projects to comply with the Program to a certain extent; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minority Business Enterprise Program – Public–Private Partnerships, Offshore Wind Projects, and Video Lottery Terminals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 553
2020-03-18SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-18SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (128-4)
2020-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {550216/1 Adopted
2020-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-03-11HouseHearing canceled (Appropriations)
2020-03-11HouseHearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
2020-03-04HouseReferred Environment and Transportation Appropriations
2020-03-03SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-02-28SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-28SenateFavorable with Amendments {299638/1 Adopted
2020-02-27SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-02-10SenateHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-10SenateHearing canceled
2020-01-29SenateHearing 2/12 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-27SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB313 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-17 - Referred Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities7704.1(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement10A404(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement11203(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government91A-10(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback