MD SB441 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that two is the maximum number of Class DBR licenses that may be issued by the Harford County Board of License Commissioners to the same person; permitting the holder of a Class DBR license in Harford County to sell beer brewed at the brewery to the extent the license holder is allowed under the license holder's Class 5 brewery license; and establishing an annual license fee of $500.
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class DBR Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 536 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (131-0) |
2018-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments {733695/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Harford County
Investments
Licenses
Prices
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Harford County
Investments
Licenses
Prices