MD SB44 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, except under certain circumstances, that a diaper-changing facility suitable for changing the diaper of an adult be installed in public buildings, in certain public restrooms, or in a public restroom which undergoes substantial renovation after October 1, 2020; requiring certain entities to report to the Department of General Services the location of a suitable diaper-changing facility; requiring the Department to maintain a list of the locations of diaper-changing facilities on its website; etc.
Title
Public Buildings - Changing Facilities for Adult Diapers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-07-20 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB10 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-14 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Age of Majority
Construction
Disabilities
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Equipment
General Services, Department of
internet
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works, Board of
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Toilets
Vulnerable Adults
Construction
Disabilities
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Equipment
General Services, Department of
internet
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works, Board of
Records
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Toilets
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 2 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0044?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0044f.pdf |