MD SB437 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Mar 27 @ 1:00 pm House Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing the alteration of the distribution of proceeds from video lottery terminals at a facility in Allegany County after 10 years of operations at the facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allegany County - Video Lottery Terminals - Distribution of Proceeds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-15HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-13SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-12SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-06SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-01SenateHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback