MD SB437 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-19 - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to require a nonresident to pay a surcharge in addition to any license fees imposed under specified laws and regulations for specified recreational fishing and crabbing licenses; requiring the Department to establish the amount of the surcharge by regulation; requiring all surcharges collected under the Act to be credited to the Fisheries Research and Development Fund and used only for oyster restoration activities; etc.
Title
Nonresident Recreational Fishing and Crabbing Licenses - Oyster Restoration Surcharge
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Frosh [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-19 | Senate | Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Pinsky) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {223621/1 |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Brinkley) Adopted |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {223621/1 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {223621/1 |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay
Crabs
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonresidents
Oysters
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Crabs
Fees
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Licenses
Natural Resources, Department of
Nonresidents
Oysters
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation