MD SB436 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the application of a specified fee assessed by the Board of Nursing for the renewal of a nurse practitioner who holds an advanced practice certification; altering the number of hours, so that the required minimum of three rotations must each consist of at least 100 hours of community-based clinical training, that a specified nurse practitioner or licensed physician must work in a specified preceptorship program in order to qualify for a specified credit against the State income tax; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Nurse Practitioner or Licensed Physician in Preceptorship Program - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 234 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {679636/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Emergency Bills
Fees
Health
Health Occupations
Income Tax
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurses
Physicians
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Continuing Education
Emergency Bills
Fees
Health
Health Occupations
Income Tax
Licenses
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurses
Physicians
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment