MD SB436 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a specified court to grant appropriate relief on a finding that a law enforcement agency obtained evidence in violation of a specified right or law under specified circumstances.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Show Cause Order - Appropriate Relief
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Frosh [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-6) (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-6) (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 165 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-6) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {808271/2 Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Law - Procedure
Discipline
Evidence
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Law - Procedure
Discipline
Evidence
Hearings
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement