MD SB436 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the governing body of a municipal corporation in Prince George's County to establish by resolution specified areas within the municipal corporation as revitalization districts; authorizing the governing body of a municipal corporation in Prince George's County to grant a property tax credit against the municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property within a designated revitalization district; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George's County - Municipal Corporations - Tax Credit for Revitalization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-19 Approved by the Governor
2011-04-03 Third Reading Passed (137-0)
2011-04-02 Second Reading Passed
2011-04-02 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-06 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
2011-03-30 Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-03-20 First Reading Ways and Means
2011-04-04 Returned Passed
2011-03-21 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2011-03-17 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2011-03-17 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2011-03-16 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2011-03-10 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-16 Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-04 First Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback