MD SB435 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law relating to licenses for keeping juke boxes for public entertainment in the State and in Harford County.
Title
Business Regulation - State and Harford County Juke Box Licenses - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2016-03-30 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-30 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-19 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Special Order until 2/18 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |