MD SB431 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland to study access to dental services for all State residents, identify areas lacking in dental services for a significant number of people, identify barriers to receiving services, analyze the impact of barriers, assess options to eliminate barriers, and make recommendations on methods to increase access to dental services; requiring the Task Force to submit an interim report by May 1, 2020, and a final report by December 1, 2020, to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force on Oral Health in Maryland

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback