MD SB431 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the State Highway Administration to sell or lease to a private entity the naming rights for all or part of a State highway; prohibiting the sale or lease of highway naming rights unless the Administration makes specified determinations; requiring the term of a contract for the sale or lease of naming rights to be at least 1 year; requiring the proceeds from the sale or lease of naming rights for all or part of a State highway be credited to the Transportation Trust Fund; etc

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Highway Naming Rights

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-08SenateHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-01SenateHearing canceled
2017-02-15SenateHearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-27SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback