MD SB431 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing the date by which Allegany County and Garrett County are required to file annual financial reports with the Department of Legislative Services is on or before December 31 after the close of the county's fiscal year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allegany County and Garrett County - Annual Financial Reports - Filing Date

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 206
2016-04-11SenateReturned Passed
2016-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2016-04-07HouseSecond Reading Passed
2016-04-07HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2016-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2016-02-26HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2016-02-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2016-02-23SenateSecond Reading Passed
2016-02-23SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2016-02-19SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-02-16SenateHearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-01SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback