MD SB431 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "on duty" in the workers' compensation law to include the performance of specified duties assigned to deputy sheriffs or members of a specified fire police unit; altering the definition of "volunteer company" to include a volunteer fire police unit; specifying that a covered member of a volunteer company may not be considered a paid covered employee of the company for receiving as a membership benefit a yearly stipend of $5,200 or less to help offset out-of-pocket expenses; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation - Emergency Responders - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-22 Approved by the Governor
2012-04-01 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
2012-03-31 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-31 Favorable with Amendments 883894/1 Report Adopted
2012-04-04 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2012-03-30 Re-referred Economic Matters
2012-03-25 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2012-04-01 Passed Enrolled
2012-04-01 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2012-04-01 Senate Concur - House Amendments
2012-03-23 Third Reading Passed (47-0)
2012-03-22 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2012-03-22 Favorable with Amendments 807275/1 Report Adopted
2012-03-26 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2012-02-02 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2012-02-02 First Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback