MD SB431 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from selling specified infant formula and baby food at auction sales unless the person makes a specified notification; authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to make specified inspections; prohibiting a person from selling specified infant formula and baby food at auction sales under specified circumstances; exempting the sale of specified items at a charity auction; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food and Cosmetics - Auction Sales - Prohibition - Exception

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-03-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-05-20 Approved by the Governor
2010-03-28 Third Reading Passed (136-0)
2010-03-27 Second Reading Passed
2010-03-27 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-04-01 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2010-03-17 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-03-03 First Reading Health and Government Operations
2010-04-01 Returned Passed
2010-03-01 Third Reading Passed (45-0)
2010-02-25 Second Reading Passed with Amendments
2010-02-25 Floor Amendment (Senator Harris) Adopted
2010-02-25 Floor Amendment (Senator Harris) Withdrawn
2010-02-24 Special Order 2/25 (Senator Harris) Adopted
2010-02-24 Floor Amendment (Senator Harris)
2010-02-24 Favorable Report Adopted
2010-02-23 Special Order 2/24 (Senator Harris) Adopted
2010-02-23 Favorable
2010-02-22 Favorable Report by Finance
2010-02-03 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2010-02-01 First Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback