MD SB430 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to sell or lease to a private entity the naming rights for rest areas and welcome centers, as specified; prohibiting the sale or lease of rest area and welcome center naming rights unless the Administration makes specified determinations; requiring the term of a contract for the sale or lease of naming rights to be at least 1 year; requiring the proceeds from the sale or lease of naming rights for rest areas and welcome centers be credited to the Transportation Trust Fund; etc.
Title
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers
Sponsors
Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Sen. George Edwards [R] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] |
Sen. Justin Ready [R] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Contracts
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Names
Public Buildings and Facilities
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Transportation - Highways
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Names
Public Buildings and Facilities
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Transportation - Highways