MD SB430 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the per capita dollar amount beginning in fiscal year 2016 that is required to be provided to each regional resource center and county public library system participating in the State's library program.
Title
Libraries - Regional Resource Centers and County Public Libraries - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-27 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {649634/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |