MD SB43 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Board of Boiler Rules in the Division of Labor and Industry in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to include a representative of owners of agricultural, model, or historical steam engine equipment rather than a representative of owners and users of heating boilers.
Title
Public Safety - Board of Boiler Rules - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | |
2010-02-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-05 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2009-11-10 | Pre-filed |