MD SB428 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the due dates of certain annual reports prepared by the Public Service Commission; and altering the due date from December 1 to January 1 of a certain report by the Department of Housing and Community Development relating to the Electric Universal Service Program.
Title
Public Utilities - Annual Reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 617 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2021-03-30 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2021-01-24 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB578 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 616
Subjects
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Public Service Commission
Reports
Time
Utility Regulation
Public Service Commission
Reports
Time
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 2 | 122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 512.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |