MD SB424 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to include $100,000 in the State budget for fiscal year 2019 for the purpose of providing a grant to the William E. Kirwan Center for Academic Innovation at the University System of Maryland for the Maryland Open Source Textbook Initiative; requiring specified funds allocated for specified purposes to be for the adoption, adaptation, and creation of specified resources that are equally accessible to and independently usable by individuals with disabilities; etc.
Title
The Textbook Cost Savings Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-2) (Y: 137 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 763 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-2) |
2017-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {434460/2 Report Adopted |
2017-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-2) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Disabilities
Education, State Department of
Grants
Higher Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Textbooks
Education, State Department of
Grants
Higher Education
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Textbooks