MD SB423 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Study the Impact of Student Cell Phone Use in the Classroom; requiring the Task Force to study the impact of cell phone use in the classroom on student learning and on teacher instruction and whether there are any benefits associated with certain cell phone usage; requiring the Task Force to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Study the Impact of Student Cell Phone Use in the Classroom

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback