MD SB422 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing, on or after January 1, 2018, the administration of specified antimicrobial drugs to cattle, swine, or poultry if, in the professional judgment of a licensed veterinarian, the administration is necessary for specified purposes; prohibiting specified antimicrobial drugs from being administered to cattle, swine, or poultry in a specified pattern or for specified purposes; requiring the Department of Agriculture each year to collect publicly available data on the use in the State of specified antimicrobial drugs; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Keep Antibiotics Effective Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-12) (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-6) (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-12) (Y: 35 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-27SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 788
2017-04-10SenatePassed Enrolled
2017-04-10SenateThird Reading Passed (35-12)
2017-04-10SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2017-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (132-6)
2017-04-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {540414/1 Report Adopted
2017-04-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2017-03-29HouseHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-21HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2017-03-20SenateThird Reading Passed (35-12)
2017-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-17SenateFloor Amendment {163426/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
2017-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {124736/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-16SenateLaid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2017-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments {124736/1
2017-03-16SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-02-14SenateHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-27SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0422&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0422f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0422t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0422e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_788_sb0422e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0422_12473601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0422_16342601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0422_54041401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb0422.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0422_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0422_env.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0422,s-0692&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0422,s-1371&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0422,h-1308&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback