MD SB421 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB895
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Replacing references to Columbus Day in certain provisions of law with references to Indigenous Peoples' Day; and establishing that Indigenous Peoples' Day is to be observed on October 12 or, if the United States Congress designates another day for the observance of Columbus Day, the day designated by the United States Congress.
Title
Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB157 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-01 - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
HB895 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
HB895 (Carry Over) 2020-02-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Commercial Law | 14 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Financial Institutions | 5 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 1 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 1 | 111.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 9 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |