MD SB421 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amount a local government can spend on development projects after it has attained its acquisition goals under Program Open Space; repealing a limitation on the use of specified funds; authorizing a local government, if it qualifies for specified additional development project funds, to use 25% of the funds for land acquisition, repair or renovation of existing recreational facilities, or capital renewal under specified circumstances; and terminating the Act at the end of May 31, 2014.
Title
Program Open Space - Attainment of Acquisition Goals - Increased Allocation for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-07 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (127-0) | |
2011-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |