MD SB42 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring Baltimore City, on or before January 1, 2020, to accept payment of a fee, a fine, or other monetary payment by at least two of three methods, including by mail, in person at a certain location, or online through a City website or other third-party payment system designated by the City; and requiring all departments of the City except the Department of Transportation to offer residents who have not registered for online payments the option of paying by mail or in person at a certain location.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City - Fines, Fees, and Other Monetary Payments - Methods of Payment

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-18HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18HouseHearing canceled
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-28HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-27SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-02-25SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-25SenateFavorable with Amendments {684139/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-22SenateLaid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-02-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {684139/1
2019-02-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-18SenateHearing 1/29 at 3:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-11-07SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback