MD SB419 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Changing the name used to cite a violation of the litter control law from "Litter Control Law" to "Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law"; and altering the agency authorized in Baltimore City to enforce specified provisions relating to illegal dumping and litter control through the use of surveillance systems.
Title
Criminal Law - Litter Control Law - Enforcement
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 107 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (107-22) | |
2012-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-04-07 | Re-referred Environmental Matters | |
2012-04-01 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments 538075/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-01 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Baltimore City
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Surveillance
Hearings
Laws and Ordinances
Litter
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Names
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Refuse Disposal
Baltimore City
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Surveillance
Hearings
Laws and Ordinances
Litter
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicles
Names
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Refuse Disposal