MD SB416 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from requiring specified conditions of coverage for specified infertility benefits for a patient who is married to an individual of the same sex; providing that specified provisions of law relating to health insurance coverage of in vitro fertilization do not apply to insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide specified benefits; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Insurance - Coverage for Infertility Services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (93-45) (Y: 93 N: 45 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-10) (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-30SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 482
2015-04-10SenateReturned Passed
2015-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (93-45)
2015-04-07HouseSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-07HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-06HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2015-04-02HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-25HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2015-03-24SenateThird Reading Passed (37-10)
2015-03-24SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2015-03-24SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
2015-03-20SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments {967471/1 Report Adopted
2015-03-20SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2015-03-04SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-06SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0416?ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0416f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/sb/sb0416t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/Chapters_noln/CH_482_sb0416t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0416_96747101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0416.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0416_fin.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/sb0416_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/ag_letters/sb0416.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0416,s-0577&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0416,h-0901&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments

feedback