MD SB416 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date of specified provisions of law requiring health maintenance organizations to pay nonparticipating providers for specified services at specified rates.
Title
Health Maintenance Organizations - Payments to Nonparticipating Providers - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-03-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-03-25 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-25 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |