MD SB415 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Comptroller to distribute public contributions to a certain campaign finance entity established to receive public contributions for certain eligible candidates; requiring the State Board of Elections to make a certain determination regarding the balance of the Fair Campaign Financing Fund on or before a certain date in certain years; requiring the Governor, in fiscal year 2023, to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation of at least $4,000,000 to the Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Financing Act - Matching Fund Revisions (Maryland Fair Elections Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (43-3)
2021-04-12SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (98-38)
2021-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-08HouseMotion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2021-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {785664/1 Adopted
2021-04-08HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2021-03-20HouseHearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-20HouseReferred Ways and Means
2021-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (39-6)
2021-03-19SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-19SenateFavorable with Amendments {304235/1 Adopted
2021-03-18SenateMotion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {304235/1
2021-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-02SenateHearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
2021-01-20SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation

Same As/Similar To

HB424 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law13235(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law15102(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law15103(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law15104(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law15104.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law15105(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law15106(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law15107(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law15108(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law15109(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law15110(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law15111(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law15113(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback