MD SB415 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor to proclaim a period from September 15 to October 15 each year as Hispanic Heritage Month; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe the month with appropriate activities.
Title
State Government - Commemorative Month - Hispanic Heritage Month
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. George Della [D] | Sen. Roy Dyson [D] |
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Alexander Mooney [R] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (125-13) | |
2010-04-02 | Special Order 4/12 (Delegate Ross) Adopted | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |