MD SB414 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-06 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the definition of "mechanical repair contract"; authorizing an agent and a registered obligor under a mechanical repair contract to offer, sell, or negotiate a mechanical repair contract; establishing that an obligor or a vehicle dealer is liable for the actions of its agent under specified circumstances; requiring an obligor or a licensed vehicle dealer that uses an agent to sell a mechanical repair contract to maintain a specified list and, on request, make the list available to the Insurance Commissioner; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Mechanical Repair Contracts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {903092/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2016-03-17HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2016-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2016-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {748079/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2016-02-23SenateHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-29SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback